CA SB94 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8208, 8212, 8236, 8240, 8263, and 8499.5 of, and to add Section 8201.5 to, the Education Code, relating to child care and development, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Child care and development: priority enrollment: underserved areas.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB94 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 384.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8201.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8236 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8263 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8347.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8347.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8347.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8499.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |