CA SB939 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1771, 1788, and 1788.4 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to continuing care contracts.
Title
Continuing care contracts: cancellation: payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB939 Monning Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - SB 939 Monning Senate Third Reading By BROWN (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB939 Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - SB 939 Monning Senate Third Reading By BROWN (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB939 Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 5517.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 21). |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 14). |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3576.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 12). |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1771 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1788 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1788.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |