CA SB937 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Set for hearing April 24.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 18941.12 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 1031 and 1033 of, and to add Sections 1034 and 1035 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lactation accommodation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R., JUD., and T. & H.
2018-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code18941.12New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1031Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1033Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1034New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1035New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback