CA SB933 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 17 (commencing with Section 53080) to Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to visual and performing arts education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Visual and performing arts education: grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code53080New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback