CA SB930 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 481, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 481, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 451.5 of the Penal Code, relating to arson, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Arson.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 930 Berryhill, T. Third Reading Urgency By BIGELOW (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB930 Berryhill Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB930 Berryhill Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 481, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6161.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3705.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2978.) (March 25). |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 451.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |