CA SB930 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12301.25, 12301.6, and 12305.86 of, and to repeal Sections 12305.73 and 12305.85 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
In-home supportive services: enrollment and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB930 Evans Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 930 Evans Senate Third Reading By YAMADA (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB930 Evans (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 930 Evans Senate Third Reading By YAMADA (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB930 Evans (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2011-09-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2237.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-30 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2694.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-08-17 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-27 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-05-19 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 1034.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 930.) (May 9). | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 764.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-02-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12305.73 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12305.85 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12305.86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |