CA SB93 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2018 (Chapters 29 and 30 of the Statutes of 2018) by augmenting Item 9840-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2018: augmentation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 93 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB93 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB93 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB93 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB93 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1601.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2307.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 669.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |