CA SB93 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-04 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-04 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 (Chapter 14 of the Statutes of 2017) by amending Items 0650-001-3228, 3340-001-0318, 3900-001-3228, 3900-001-3237, 3900-002-3237, 3900-101-0115, 3900-101-3119, 3960-101-0001, 4260-111-0001, 6100-101-3309, 6100-194-0001, and 6100-196-0001 of, adding Items 0540-101-3228, 0650-101-3228, 0690-101-3228, 2740-302-0044, 3340-001-3228, 3360-101-3228, 3540-001-3228, 3540-002-3228, 3600-101-3228, 3640-101-3228, 3760-101-3228, 3900-101-3117, 3970-101-3228, 4700-101-3228, 6100-301-0660, and 8570-101-3228 to, and repealing Items 0860-001-3063, 3340-001-3063, and 3540-001-3063 of, Section 2.00 of, amending Section 39.00 of, and adding Section 15.14 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB93 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB93 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 24. Noes 3.) (September 14). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | September 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2825.) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1033.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |