CA SB929 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 313, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 313, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25214.2, 25214.3, 25214.3.1, 25214.3.3, 25214.4, and 25214.4.1 of, to amend the heading of Article 10.1.1 (commencing with Section 25214.1) of Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of, and to add Section 25214.3.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Hazardous materials: children's jewelry: heavy metals.
Sponsors
Asm. Julia Brownley [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Asm. Mary Salas [D] | Asm. Lori Saldana [D] | Asm. Tom Torlakson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB929 Pavley (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Assembly - SB 929 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB929 Pavley (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Assembly - SB 929 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB929 Pavley (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 313, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4884.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-20 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 6365.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committe August 12.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-05-13 | To Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2010-04-26 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-04-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 3325.) To Assembly. | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3299.) | |
2010-04-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2010-03-26 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-02-11 | To Com. on EQ. | |
2010-02-02 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 4. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |