CA SB925 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16501 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB925 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - SB 925 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB925 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - SB 925 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB925 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5027.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5978.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4941.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4813.) (April 24). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |