CA SB924 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17131.8 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: exclusion: National Guard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB924 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and V.A.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4299.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4790.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4623.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2018-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and V.A.
2018-01-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17131.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback