CA SB921 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 84504.6 of, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 84550) to Chapter 4 of Title 9 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: digital political advertisements.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3513.) (April 26). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (March 28). |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84504.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84550 | New Code | See Bill Text |