CA SB921 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 474 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State highways: Route 174: relinquishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB921 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-06-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3622.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-13SenateSet for hearing May 29.
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-02-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code474Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback