CA SB920 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6738 and 8729 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 16101, 16956, and 16959 of the Corporations Code, relating to limited liability partnerships.
Title
Engineering, land surveying, and architecture: limited liability partnerships.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Sen. Mike Morrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 920 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB920 Cannella et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB920 Cannella et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4230.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4813.) (April 24). |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4588.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6738 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8729 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 16101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 16956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 16959 | Amended Code | Citation Text |