CA SB92 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2699.5 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 2699.3 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-27 - Assembly - SB 92 Umberg Third Reading Urgency By Kalra (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB92 Umberg et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB92 Umberg (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2024.
2024-07-01 Approved by the Governor.
2024-06-27 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2024-06-27SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-06-27SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2024-06-27SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-06-27AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2024-06-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2024-06-24AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2024-06-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2024-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-04-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-01-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3047.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-01-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2024-01-10SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2024-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2958.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2024-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB S.
2024-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code2699.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code2699.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback