CA SB913 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 1720.5 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public works: City of Los Angeles: graffiti abatement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB913 Hertzberg (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-24AssemblyJune 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4877.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4816.) (April 25).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-03-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1720.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1782Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback