CA SB913 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44125 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Vehicular air pollution: vehicle retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB913 DeSaulnier (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB913 DeSaulnier (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3595.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3704.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |