CA SB912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 661, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 661, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50909 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
California Housing Finance Agency: management compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB912 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 912 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB912 Beall et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 912 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB912 Beall et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 661, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5604.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 5578.) |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Set for hearing August 21. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6310.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4399.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4299.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4821.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50480 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50909 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53605 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4597.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |