CA SB910 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1367.29 and 1368.016 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10113.9, 10123.7, 10123.81, 10123.865, 10123.866, 10123.198, 10123.199, 10123.202, 10273.6, and 12671 of, and to add Section 10123.61 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Short-term limited duration health insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB910 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 910 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB910 Hernandez et al (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 5422.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 6300.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4230.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4375.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-28SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback