CA SB910 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21460 and 21750 of, and to add Section 21750.1 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: bicycles: passing distance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB910 Lowenthal Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - SB 910 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB910 Lowenthal (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - SB 910 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB910 Lowenthal (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained. | |
2011-10-07 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2011-10-07 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2402.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-06 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 25. Page 2937.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2686.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 865.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21750.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |