CA SB906 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1.4 (commencing with Section 14045.10) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health services and substance use disorder treatment: peer support specialist certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 906 Beall Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB906 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB906 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB906 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB906 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4399.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4299.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4375.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14045.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |