CA SB905 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 23428.29 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverage control.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control: club licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB905 Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 905 Bates Senate Third Reading By CHAVEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB905 Bates (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 905 Bates Senate Third Reading By CHAVEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB905 Bates (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5428.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5883.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3712.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3492.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19424 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23428.29 | New Code | See Bill Text |