CA SB903 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 232, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 232, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 489 of the Penal Code, relating to grand theft, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Grand theft: agricultural equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 903 Grove Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB903 Grove Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB903 Grove Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 232, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5279.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3684.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3568.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 489 | Amended Code | Citation Text |