CA SB901 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 626, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 815.11 to the Civil Code, to add Section 65040.21 to the Government Code, to add Section 38535 to the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 4213.05, 4290, 4527, 4584, 4589, 4593.2, 4597, 4597.1, 4597.2, 4597.6, and 4799.05 of, to add Sections 4123.5, 4124.7, 4290.1, 4584.1, and 4584.2 to, to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 4205) to Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, to add and repeal Section 4556 of, and to repeal Section 4597.20 of, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 399.20.3, 854, 959, 1731, 2107, 8386, and 8387 of, to add Sections 451.1, 451.2, 748.1, 764, 854.2, 8386.1, 8386.2, 8386.5, and 8388 to, to add Article 5.8 (commencing with Section 850) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, and to repeal and add Section 706 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to wildfires.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildfires.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 901 Dodd Conference Report By HOLDEN (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Conference Report SB901 Dodd et al (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 901 Dodd Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB901 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB901 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 626, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to enrgrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly adopted Conference Committee report.
2018-08-31SenateSenate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 29. Noes 4.)
2018-08-29SenateFrom printer.
2018-08-28SenateTo print.
2018-08-28SenateFrom Conference Committee: Be adopted. Ayes 7: Senators Dodd, Jackson, and Stone. Assembly Members Holden, Reyes, Dahle, and Wood. Noes 1: Senator Cannella.
2018-07-06SenateAssembly Members Holden (Co-chair), Dahle, Mayes, Reyes, and Wood appointed to Conference Committee.
2018-07-05SenateSenators Dodd (Co-chair), Cannella, Hueso, Jackson, and Stone appointed to Conference Committee.
2018-07-05Senate(Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 6099.)
2018-07-05SenateJoint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended in Assembly.
2018-07-05Senate(Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5102.)
2018-07-05SenateJoint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended in Senate.
2018-07-05SenateOrdered to Conference Committee.
2018-07-05SenateSenate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 0. Noes 35. Page 5102.)
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 6099.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-02AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-07-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 69 suspended.
2018-07-02AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-07-02AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-07-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4299.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4717.) (April 17).
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-01-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code815.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65040.21New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code38535New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4123.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4124.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4213.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4290Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4290.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4527Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4556Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4584Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4584.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4584.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4589Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4593.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4597Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4597.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4597.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4597.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4799.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code1731Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2107Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code399.20.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code451.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code451.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code748.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code764New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code8386Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code8386.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code8386.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code8387Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8388New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code854Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code854.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code959Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback