CA SB901 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 800) to Chapter 4 of Division 1 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation projects: Advanced Mitigation Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 800 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_901&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0901-0950/sb_901_bill_20160121_introduced.html |