CA SB900 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 10072.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Electronic benefits transfer system: CalFresh supplemental benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Wiener et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGRI. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4398.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4696.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and AGRI. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10072.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |