CA SB9 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 4210) of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
State responsibility areas: fire prevention fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | March 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | March 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4210 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB9 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB9 |