CA SB9 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 710, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 710, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 75220, 75221, and 75222 of, and to add Sections 75223, 75224, and 75225 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: Transit and Intercity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB9 Beall Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB9 Beall Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB9 Beall (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB9 Beall Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB9 Beall (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 710, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2502.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2842.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 19). |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1286.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1145.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 824.) (April 28). |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 349.) (March 18). |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and T. & H. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 75220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 75221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 75222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 75223 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 75224 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 75225 | New Code | See Bill Text |