CA SB9 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 12099) to Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government: social innovation and entrepreneurship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2013-03-27SenateHearing postponed by committee.
2013-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2013-01-10SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O.
2012-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2012-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12099New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback