CA SB899 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 527.9 of, and to add Sections 527.11 and 527.12 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 3044 and 6389 of the Family Code, and to amend Sections 1524, 11108.2, 18120, 25555, 26379, 26405, 26540, 28100, 29810, 29830, and 30342 of, and to add Section 18120.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to protective orders.
Title
Protective orders: firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3283.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 527.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 527.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 527.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3044 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 6389 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11108.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18120.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 25555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26379 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30342 | Amended Code | Citation Text |