CA SB899 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4663 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB899 Pan Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 899 Pan Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB899 Pan (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5545.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6402.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4345.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4816.) (April 25).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
2018-03-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code115Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code4663Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code4665New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback