CA SB896 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 928, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 5.9 (commencing with Section 11549.63) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to artificial intelligence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generative Artificial Intelligence Accountability Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent SB896 Dodd et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 896 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB896 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 928, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-04 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2024-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5612.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-08-27SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2024-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-08-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6546.) Ordered to the Senate.
2024-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2024-08-07AssemblyAugust 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2024-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2024-06-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2024-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2024-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4207.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-05-22SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2024-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3962.) (May 16).
2024-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2024-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2024-04-22SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2024-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3634.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-04-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3528.) (April 9).
2024-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16 in JUD. pending receipt.
2024-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2024-02-14SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2024-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2024-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11549.63New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896#93ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896#92CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB896

Bill Comments

feedback