CA SB894 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 618, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 618, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 675.1 and 2051.5 of, and to add Section 10103.7 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Property insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB894 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 894 Dodd Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB894 Dodd et al (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 894 Dodd Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB894 Dodd et al (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 618, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 6135.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6959.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4342.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4884.) (April 25). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10103.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 2051.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 675.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |