CA SB893 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 7. Page 4724.)
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 7. Page 4724.)
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65915 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning: density bonus: vehicular parking ratio.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 7. Page 4724.) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |