CA SB889 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2827 of, and to add Section 1646.14 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Nurse anesthetists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1646.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB889 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB889#99INT |