CA SB885 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1749.5 of the Civil Code, relating to gift certificates.
Title
Gift certificates: redemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB885 Corbett (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 885 Corbett Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB885 Corbett (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 885 Corbett Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB885 Corbett (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 4907.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6534.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-19 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6352.) | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6328.) To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-22 | Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2010-06-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3794.) To Assembly. | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-04-06 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-05 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-03-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-03-23 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3001.) | |
2010-03-11 | Set for hearing March 23. | |
2010-02-04 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2010-01-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 19. | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |