CA SB884 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 16587, 16587.5, 16588, and 16589 of the Government Code, relating to state and local government.
Title
Tax administration: state and local government: sale of
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2012-01-05 | Set for hearing January 11. Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-04-28 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16587 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16587.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16588 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16589 | New Code | See Bill Text |