CA SB881 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 844.7 to the Government Code, relating to government liability.
Title
Government tort claims: incarcerated plaintiffs.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Harman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-01-21 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2010-01-14 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 13. | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |