CA SB879 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 457, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 457, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8545 and 69614.3 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 1797.165 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB879 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 879 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB879 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 879 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB879 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 457, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6045.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6787.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6286.) |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4931.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69614.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |