CA SB879 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 16 (commencing with Section 54000) to Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable Housing Bond Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 879 Beall Third Reading Urgency Amend By CHIU Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB879 Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom Assembly without further action.
2016-11-30AssemblyDied on third reading.
2016-08-19AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 20. Page 5991.) Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2016-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 11).
2016-06-29AssemblyJune 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2016-06-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 15).
2016-06-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2016-06-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2016-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-06-01SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4085.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-05-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3998.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-24SenateSet for hearing May 27.
2016-05-23SenateMay 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2016-05-13SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2016-05-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3835.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 11. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2016-05-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3754.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2016-04-28SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2016-04-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2016-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2016-03-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 7).
2016-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2016-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2016-01-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65589.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code53570New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code54000New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_879&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20160115_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20160330_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20160428_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20160505_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20160609_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20160616_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20160815_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20160819_amended_asm_v92.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20160503_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20160511_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20160523_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20160527_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20160601_1047AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20160615_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20160811_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20160819_1027AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback