CA SB876 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6321.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to tidelands and submerged lands.
Title
Tidelands and submerged lands: shore protection: lease
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Harman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-20 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-04-07 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-23 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6321.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_876&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_876_bill_20110218_introduced.html |