CA SB875 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5795, 14549.2, and 14581 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 12987.5 of, and to add Section 10609.21 to, the Water Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB875 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 875 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 73 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB875 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 875 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 73 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB875 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 6041.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 7. Page 6781.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6286.) |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4930.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14549.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14581 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5795 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10609.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 12987.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |