CA SB874 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 5956.10 of the Government Code, to amend Section 50661 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 25416 and 31111.5 of, and to add Section 5080.43 to, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 62 and 193 of Chapter 35 of the Statutes of 2014, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 874 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By SKINNER Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB874 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 874 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By SKINNER Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB874 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.) |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6332.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 14). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3136.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 5956.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25416 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 31111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5080.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 379.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |