CA SB873 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19829.9847, 19829.9848, and 22944.5 of, and to add Sections 20683.6, 20683.61, 20683.62, 20683.7, 20683.71, 20683.72, and 22958.1.7 to, the Government Code, relating to state public employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State public employment: memorandum of understanding: approval: State Bargaining Units 9 and 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB873 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 873 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB873 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 873 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB873 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 6044.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 20. Page 6786.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6705.) |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4929.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19829.9847 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9848 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20683.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.62 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20683.72 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22958.1.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |