CA SB871 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 52074.5 and 52074.6 to the Education Code, relating to school accountability.
Title
California Collaborative for Educational Excellence: professional development training: pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB871 Liu (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4090.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3998.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3200.) (March 9). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52074.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 52074.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |