CA SB871 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44021 to the Education Code, relating to school district employees.
Title
School district employees: compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-11 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-27 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44021 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 45028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |