CA SB87 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 384 and 1010.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 11040, 11041, 11042, 11045, 24000, 69580, 69592, 69594, and 69600 of, to add Sections 15007, 15820.948, 68514, and 69614.4 to, to add Article 9 (commencing with 70500) to Chapter 5.7 of Title 8 of, to add Chapter 17.8 (commencing with Section 7310) to Division 7 of Title 1 of, to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 27770) to Part 3 of Division 2 of Title 3 of, to add and repeal Section 12532 of, and to repeal Section 11043 of, the Government Code, to add Section 329 to the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 1170.18, 1370, 1370.6, 1372, 1463.007, 1464, 1557, 2801, 2808, 3453, 5075, 6031, 6031.1, 29800, 29805, 30680, and 30900 of, to add Sections 1170.127 and 4032 to, to repeal Sections 1203.6 and 1464.2 of, and to repeal and add Section 1203.5 of, the Penal Code, to add and repeal Section 10340.1 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 13365, 13365.2, 40509, and 40509.5 of the Vehicle Code, and to amend Sections 209, 1982, 4100, 4358.5, 7228, and 7234 of, and to repeal and add Sections 270 and 271 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety: omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB87 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 2161.) |
2017-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1031.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |