CA SB87 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13332.19, 15816, 15817.1, 15820.903, 15820.913, 15820.922, 15831, 15832, and 15848 of, and to repeal Section 15770.5 of, the Government Code, relating to public works, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public works: building construction.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB87 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 382.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13332.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15770.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15816 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15817.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.913 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15831 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15832 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15848 | Amended Code | Citation Text |