CA SB87 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, to take effect immediately, Budget Bill.
Title
2011-12 Budget.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-28 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB87 Leno Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - SB 87 Leno Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB87 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - SB 87 Leno Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB87 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending. | |
2011-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-06-30 | Approved by the Governor with item veto. | |
2011-06-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 p.m. | |
2011-06-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 19. Page 1618.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 2092.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 2092.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-03-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2011-02-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-02-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 169.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-02-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |