CA SB868 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 830.7 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 21012 of, and to add Part 1.5 (commencing with Section 21750) to Division 9 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to aviation.
Title
State Remote Piloted Aircraft Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB868 Jackson (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB868 Jackson (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and TRANS. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4084.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3998.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3612.) (April 19). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3396.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 830.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 21750 | New Code | See Bill Text |